U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00229-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 25, 2022: [Reply (when not to a motion)]
  • October 25, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • October 25, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Order]
  • September 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 16, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.