U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00251-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bonar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 09, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • June 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 12, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • February 24, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 16, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.