U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00249-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Corral-Enriquez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 07, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 24, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 16, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.