U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00242-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez-Ruiz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
November, 2024
  • November 19, 2024: [CJA Appointment]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Transmission of Record on Appeal to USCA]
  • December 19, 2022: [USCA Order]
  • December 19, 2022: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • December 13, 2022: [Supplemental Record on Appeal Sent to USCA]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Transmission of Record on Appeal to USCA]
  • November 22, 2022: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • October 26, 2022: [Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA]
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • October 13, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 16, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.