U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00240-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cardenas-Herrarte
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 10, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
June, 2022
  • June 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 28, 2022: [Minute Order]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • March 09, 2022: [Vacate]
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of JERS Utilization]
  • March 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • February 28, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • February 25, 2022: [Exhibit List]
  • February 25, 2022: [Witness List]
  • February 25, 2022: [Unseal Document]
  • February 24, 2022: [Unseal Document]
  • February 24, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 16, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.