U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00238-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lovato et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 17, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 03, 2023: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 03, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Downward Departure]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • July 15, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • July 14, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • June 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • May 13, 2022: [Dismiss]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 28, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • February 24, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • February 16, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.