U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00250-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez-Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 16, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • September 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Protective Order]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Psychiatric/Psychological Exam]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 29, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • March 21, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 18, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • February 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • February 16, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
  • February 16, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.