U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:10-cr-00336-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
May, 2022
  • May 30, 2022: [Minute Order]
March, 2022
  • March 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 12, 2022: [Order]
  • March 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 11, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Revocation Hearing]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 18, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • February 18, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.