U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00259-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez-Reyes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Transcript Order Form]
  • January 02, 2023: [Transcript Order Form]
  • January 02, 2023: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Transmission of Record on Appeal to USCA]
  • December 05, 2022: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • December 05, 2022: [Transcript Order Form]
  • December 01, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • December 01, 2022: [Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
February, 2022
  • February 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.