U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00252-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Maldonado, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • April 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 05, 2022: [Minute Order]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 28, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 07, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 02, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • March 02, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • February 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 24, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.