U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00276-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ration
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Revocation Hearing]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • August 02, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • August 02, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 22, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.