U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00164-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Madrid
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 07, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 24, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
  • February 22, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.