U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00272-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moore
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Transfer Out - Probation/Supervised Release]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Transferring Jurisdiction - Part I]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 19, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • February 22, 2022: [Detain]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.