U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00226-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Serrano-Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order of Detention Pending Revocation Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 07, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 01, 2022: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 22, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.