U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01707-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 09, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 19, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 24, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • February 24, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.