U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00592-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Goodmoney
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • December 02, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 09, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 04, 2022: [Reconsideration]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 30, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 07, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 06, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • May 10, 2022: [Dismiss]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 13, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 01, 2022: [Discovery Order]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • February 25, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • February 25, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • February 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.