U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00306-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barron-Barrios
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 19, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 19, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 01, 2022: [Discovery Order]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.