U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00307-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jimenez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 17, 2022: [Minute Order]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 14, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 01, 2022: [Discovery Order]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.