U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01220-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bland, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 06, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 05, 2022: [Extend (other)]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • June 02, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Extend (other)]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 28, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 25, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 18, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 01, 2022: [Compel]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 02, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • February 28, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • February 28, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.