U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00300-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Eddings
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 22, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 26, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • June 28, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 29, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 04, 2022: [Discovery Order]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.