U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00298-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 09, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • March 08, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • March 07, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • March 06, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 03, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • March 02, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • March 02, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
February, 2022
  • February 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.