U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00286-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Torres
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 04, 2022: [Release from Custody]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 06, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • March 06, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 02, 2022: [Oral Order]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.