U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:12-cr-02520-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Casaus
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Response to Motion]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • April 18, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • March 24, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 07, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
  • March 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.