U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-01778-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 24, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 23, 2025: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • April 15, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 15, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order]
  • August 16, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • August 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 23, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 23, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 06, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • March 06, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 02, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.