U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00284-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Coursin
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 13, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 08, 2022: [Minute Order]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Downward Departure]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
April, 2022
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.