U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00305-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Buck
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 27, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 24, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • June 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 15, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 25, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 25, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 06, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 04, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • March 02, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.