U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00288-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Joe
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 01, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 26, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 03, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • March 01, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.