U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00289-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Manwill
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 28, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 15, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 19, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 22, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 23, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • March 21, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 07, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 03, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.