U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00293-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Livingston
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Witness List]
  • December 29, 2022: [In Limine]
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 25, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 27, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 07, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 03, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.