U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01578-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Quintana
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 18, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 08, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 17, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 14, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 04, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.