U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cr-00345-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • September 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • July 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 18, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • March 03, 2022: [Reconsideration]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.