U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-01986-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 12, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 14, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 10, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 08, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.