U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00346-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jardines-Luqueno
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Order]
  • September 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • August 03, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • August 03, 2022: [Response to Motion]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.