U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00352-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • September 26, 2022: [Dismiss]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 16, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order to Prepare Petty PSR (Text Only)]
  • July 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 20, 2022: [Minute Order]
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.