U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00355-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Abarca-Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • July 11, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 20, 2022: [Downward Departure]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.