U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00116-1
  • Case Name: USA v. John
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 24, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 11, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 04, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 11, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 09, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.