U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00292-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Dixon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 11, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 11, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 09, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • March 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.