U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00375-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Del Rio Escobedo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 23, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 20, 2023: [Modify Conditions of Release]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 08, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 19, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 07, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • June 17, 2022: [Release from Custody]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 14, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 09, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • June 02, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • June 01, 2022: [Release from Custody]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 22, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • May 22, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • May 18, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • May 18, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • May 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 17, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 18, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 22, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.