U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00370-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia-Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 03, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
May, 2022
  • May 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 01, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 21, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.