U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00369-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Oliva-Delcid
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 13, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 14, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.