U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00366-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reveles-Solorio
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Downward Adjustment]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 24, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 06, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 07, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 16, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.