U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00373-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Stumpf
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 27, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 21, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
  • September 19, 2022: [Release from Custody]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 25, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 19, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 15, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.