U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00363-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Vigil
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 05, 2023: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 31, 2022: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
  • October 27, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 15, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 21, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 15, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.