U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00361-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Boyce
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 04, 2023: [Minute Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Release from Custody]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 21, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • September 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • September 19, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 14, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Discovery Order]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 06, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 28, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 31, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 05, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 15, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.