U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00383-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • November 01, 2022: [Release from Custody]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Order]
  • August 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • April 22, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 10, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.