U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01714-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzales
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 05, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • December 05, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 11, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • October 11, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 08, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • August 08, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • May 04, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 18, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • March 17, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • March 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 15, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • March 14, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.