U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00403-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Canchola-Isarraraz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.