U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00404-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jarrett
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • June 10, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • April 13, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • April 13, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.