U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00374-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clark
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Downward Departure]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
  • October 05, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • September 28, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 28, 2022: [Hearing]
  • September 27, 2022: [Travel]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • July 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 25, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 24, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 23, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • March 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.