U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00407-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Munoz-Diaz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 22, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • June 17, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • April 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.